Senate | 03/31/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-197. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Almond motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 815 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Orr motion to Concur in and Adopt adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Executive Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 643 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 257 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 256 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Orr Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Orr motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 255 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 254 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |