Senate | 04/06/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-391. | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 942 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Concurrence Requested | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 887 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 886 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Collins Amendment Offered | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 368 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 367 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Education Policy Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported from Education Policy as Favorable with 1 amendment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |