Senate | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-376. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1091 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Concurrence Requested | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Kiel intended to vote "Nay" | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1006 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1005 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | State Government Amendment Offered | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 819 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Melson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 807 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |