Senate | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-358. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 994 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 993 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 870 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |