House | 03/10/2022 | Rereferred from W&ME to EP | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 164 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 163 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Education Policy first Substitute Offered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |