Senate | 03/03/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-123. | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 468 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 307 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 306 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Barfoot Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |