House | 05/26/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Adopt 6FYU1Z-1 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Healthcare 6FYU1Z-1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Healthcare | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Add Cosponsor | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Adopt U7LCGX-1 | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Health | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Health | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |