Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Concur In and Adopt
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Conference Committee on HB124 Q8NZ54-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Accede to Conference Committee on HB124
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Accede
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Adopt G0NW22-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund G0NW22-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Adopt HK5V36-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund HK5V36-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|