House
|
06/06/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Concur In and Adopt
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Conference Committee on HB192 QROU44-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Accede to Conference Committee on HB192
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Adopt Y1AWN2-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|