House
|
06/06/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Adopt ZZO5WW-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Boards, Agencies and Commissions ZZO5WW-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Boards, Agencies and Commissions VUBIVP-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|