House
|
06/01/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopt IY5D6W-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reconsider
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopt
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopt NGCSTJ-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopt HBLX88-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
AMD/SUB 7HMKEV-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security HBLX88-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security 6PDRZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security O1GHMJ-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|