Senate | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Adopt WFZC9E-1 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund WFZC9E-1 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means General Fund 916ZPP-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means General Fund | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |