Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Adopt 144N3Z-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit 144N3Z-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit M8CVWH-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|