Senate | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Table MID7H1-1 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Adopt SKSG55-1 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Commerce and Small Business | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Commerce and Small Business | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |