Senate | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Healthcare | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Adopt UQ68XG-1 | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Health UQ68XG-1 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Health | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Health TOV695-1 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Carry Over by House Health | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Health | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |