Senate | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary 79O3EV-1 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Adopt ZSZ9RK-1 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Adopt 85Q5H2-1 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary 85Q5H2-1 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |