Senate | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Adopt AH3AQ7-1 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Adopt 5EWPM6-1 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 5EWPM6-1 | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education BUN344-1 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education ZE0ARK-1 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Carry Over by House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |