House | 05/25/2023 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Committee to Senate County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Carry Over by House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced and Referred to House Jefferson County Legislation | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |