House
|
05/25/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Committee to Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Adopt GP77CC-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security GP77CC-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security MZDX11-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security 6PM2ZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|