Senate | 06/07/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Adopt ALMB7Q-1 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Adopt WFCMEE-1 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported Favorably from House State Government | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Committee to House State Government | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate State Government WFCMEE-1 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |