Senate | 05/31/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Indefinitely Postpone | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Adopt ZEJ2RK-1 | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security ZEJ2RK-1 | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security 85VAF2-1 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Adopt UBL3DG-1 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |