Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Adopt 7YIF2E-1 | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt MPGXWW-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |