Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Concur In and Adopt
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate Conference Committee on SB175 RHURNM-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Accede to Conference Committee on SB175
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Adopt 8ZDLF2-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 8ZDLF2-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|