House | 06/06/2023 | Indefinitely Postpone | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Health | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Health 1YTE33-1 | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Health | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Health VT2QPP-1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Adopt 4QAOI3-1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Adopt YH7366-1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Adopt RU3UNM-1 | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Healthcare RU3UNM-1 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |