House | 05/11/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Favorably from House County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Committee to House County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Adopt 6PAV3Z-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Adopt MZN9HW-1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |