Senate | 06/07/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Concur In and Adopt | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Adopt IYK56W-1 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by House Judiciary IYK56W-1 | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt 0EIOCC-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Adopt HHXF63-1 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |