House | 05/11/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Health | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Health | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate State Governmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Prefiled |