Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Concur In and Adopt
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Adopt IJSX66-1
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred to Committee to House Public Safety and Homeland Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopt 2NFXII-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Table E5QEC2-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Table 1RX6LL-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Table PJ1DER-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary 1RX6LL-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary E5QEC2-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate Judiciary PJ1DER-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|