House
|
06/06/2023
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Executive Amendment ID2921
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Concur In and Adopt
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Adopt NXWC8J-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Table
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
On Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read Second Time in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably from House State Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred to Committee to House State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read First Time in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Adopt RXCQYY-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Adopt F60P55-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
On Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read Second Time in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported Favorably from Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate County and Municipal Government RXCQYY-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Amendment/Substitute by Senate County and Municipal Government F60P55-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Introduced and Referred to Senate County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read First Time in House of Origin
|
|
|