Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Temporarily | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Adopt 0E22GG-1 | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 0E22GG-1 | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin |