Senate | 05/04/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Baldwin County Legislation | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Baldwin County Legislation | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Carried Over to Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Carry Over | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Local Legislation | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Prefiled |