Senate | 05/16/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Ready to Enroll | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Read a Third Time and Pass | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | On Third Reading in Second House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Read Second Time in Second House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in Second House | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported Favorably from House Education Policy | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Committee to House Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Read First Time in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Adopt 352RVE-1 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | On Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read Second Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported Favorably from Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Read First Time in House of Origin | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced and Referred to Senate Education Policy |