House | 05/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1185 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Smitherman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1184 L1CIYYA-1 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Smitherman 1st Amendment Offered L1CIYYA-1 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Pending Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 95 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |