House | 04/24/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 433 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Pending Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 25 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin to House Ports, Waterways & Intermodal Transit | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House State Government | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled |