Senate | 05/07/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Pending Senate Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 755 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 754 8J7YFFF-1 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered 8J7YFFF-1 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 8J7YFFF-1 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted 47TG33R-1 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |