Senate | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Pending Senate Education Policy | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 950 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 949 4J94I3R-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | DuBose 1st Substitute Offered 4J94I3R-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | DuBose motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 948 B73MQQJ-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered B73MQQJ-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Education Policy B73MQQJ-1 | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Education Policy 1st Amendment QDGJ414-1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |