Senate | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 955 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 954 MMQFHHH-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Brown 1st Substitute Offered MMQFHHH-1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Pending House Military and Veterans Affairs | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |