Senate | 05/02/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment XHKIE7Z-1 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 252 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 251 5PBJ666-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Ways and Means Education Engrossed Substitute Offered 5PBJ666-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 5PBJ666-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted 67WH1ZZ-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |