House | 05/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1181 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 537 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 536 NAFZJJ8-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered NAFZJJ8-1 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Education Policy NAFZJJ8-1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Education Policy 1st Amendment HTTA833-1 | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Pending House Education Policy | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |