HB271INTRODUCED Page 0 HB271 9C26PP-1 By Representatives Fidler, Givens (N & P) RFD: Baldwin County Legislation First Read: 29-Feb-24 1 2 3 4 5 9C26PP-1 02/28/2024 JC (F)tgw 2023-2892 Page 1 First Read: 29-Feb-24 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT Relating to Baldwin County, amending Section 45-2-240, Code of Alabama 1975, to further provide for the supplemental per diem paid to board of equalization members retroactive to January 1, 2024; to provide for the annual increase of the supplemental payment according to the Consumer Price Index; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA: Section 1. Section 45-2-240, Code of Alabama 1975, is amended to read as follows: "ยง45-2-240 (a)(1)a. In addition to the per diem paid by the state pursuant to the general law, the members of the Baldwin County Board of Equalization shall receive a supplement in an amount sufficient to bring the per diem to one hundred fifty dollars ($150)two hundred dollars ($200), for the years 2008 and 2009, including any days the board has met in 2008 prior to April 8, 2008, and one hundred dollars ($100) starting for the calendar year 2024 and thereafter, as adjusted pursuant to paragraph b. This supplement rate shall also be paid for any days the board 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 HB271 INTRODUCED Page 2 This supplement rate shall also be paid for any days the board meets in 2024 before the effective date of this act . b. Effective after January 1, 2025, the supplemental amount provided in this subdivision shall be increased annually based on the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all urban consumers for the immediately preceding calendar year as published by the U.S. Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics. (2)a. The board members shall be allowed mileage after the annual allowance set by general law has been exhausted ., which shall be paid The mileage shall be at the same rate as that paid to state employees for official business. b. Any mileage paid pursuant to this sectionsubdivision shall be for mileage incurred in any necessary business directly related to the duties of the office, including, but not limited to, the inspection of property and travel between the member's residence and the location set for hearing taxpayer protests. (b) The additional compensation provided for by this section shall be paid on a pro rata basis by the political subdivisions or funds in the county receiving ad valorem taxes by computing the percentage that the amount any political subdivision or fund in the county receives bears to the total local ad valorem taxes Each political subdivision or fund in the county receiving ad valorem taxes shall contribute to the payment of the supplemental amounts provided for in subsection (a) on a pro rata basis based on the percentage each political subdivision or fund receives of the total local ad valorem taxes collected in the county ." 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 41 42 43 44 45 46 47 48 49 50 51 52 53 54 55 56 HB271 INTRODUCED Page 3 taxes collected in the county ." Section 2. This act shall become effective on October 1, 2024. 57 58