Senate | 05/08/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 808 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Pending House Ways and Means Education | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |