Senate | 04/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 698 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |