Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Pending Senate State Governmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on State Governmental Affairs | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 534 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Pending House State Government | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |