House | 05/08/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 947 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Re-referred to Committee in Second House to Senate County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 688 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Pending House Commerce and Small Business | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Commerce and Small Business |