Senate | 03/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 107 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 106 G59H226-1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bedsole Amendment Offered G59H226-1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 105 36X2VEE-1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | PS&HS Reported Substitute Offered from House Public Safety and Homeland Security 36X2VEE-1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 36X2VEE-1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted 7P4BVV2-1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Prefiled |