Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Children and Youth Health 1st Amendment Z8XAKRW-1 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Pending Senate Children and Youth Health | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Children and Youth Health | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 249 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 248 94NFPMM-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Faulkner 1st Amendment Offered 94NFPMM-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 247 PFH7EGG-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Judiciary 1st Substitute Offered PFH7EGG-1 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Committee Substitute Adopted PFH7EGG-1 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Judiciary | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Prefiled |