House | 04/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Ready to Enroll | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 399 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Third Reading in Second House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Pending Senate Healthcare | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 90 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Health | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Prefiled |