House
|
05/16/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1113
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Sessions motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1112 Y31A622-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Sessions 1st Amendment Offered Y31A622-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1112
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 442
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 441 XJJ2Z7E-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Hill 2nd Amendment Offered XJJ2Z7E-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 440 7SL32EE-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Hill 1st Amendment Offered 7SL32EE-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 439 411UR33-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Bolton 1st Amendment Offered 411UR33-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 438 PMLKGRR-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Pettus 1st Amendment Offered PMLKGRR-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 437 FYV8C55-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund Engrossed Substitute Offered FYV8C55-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee Substitute Adopted ITLYZWW-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted FYV8C55-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted ZLH6WRR-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Prefiled
|
|
|