Senate | 04/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Banking and Insurance 1st Amendment J23ZFYF-1 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Pending Senate Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Banking and Insurance | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 429 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 428 FY4ZC5C-1 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Insurance 1st Substitute Offered FY4ZC5C-1 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Substitute Adopted FY4ZC5C-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Insurance | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Insurance | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled |