Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1162
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 897
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Jones motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 896 GQHQCCC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Jones 1st Substitute Offered GQHQCCC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Carried Over
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Jones 1st Substitute Offered GQHQCCC-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|